Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Philippe Nakellentuba Cardinal Ouédraogo

Archbishop of Ouagadougou

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Consolatrice al Tiburtino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1945 BornKonéan
14 Jul 197328.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kaya, Burkina Faso
5 Jul 199651.4AppointedBishop of Ouahigouya, Burkina Faso
23 Nov 199651.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ouahigouya, Burkina Faso
13 May 200964.3AppointedArchbishop of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
22 Feb 201469.1Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 201469.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Consolatrice al Tiburtino
27 Apr 201469.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Consolatrice al Tiburtino

MicroData Summary for Philippe Nakellentuba Ouédraogo:
Philippe Nakellentuba Cardinal Ouédraogo (born ) Archbishop of Ouagadougou

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Ouagadougou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,866
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014
  • cp: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014
  • i: Bollettino, 24 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Apr 2014