Catholic-Hierarchy DC

SeŠn Baptist Cardinal Brady

Archbishop Emeritus of Armagh

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1939 BornDrumcalpin
22 Feb 196424.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 199455.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland
19 Feb 199555.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland
1 Oct 199657.1SucceededArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
3 Nov 199657.2InstalledArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
24 Nov 200768.3Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 200768.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
16 Jan 200868.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
8 Sep 201475.1RetiredArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for SeŠn Baptist Brady:
SeŠn Baptist Cardinal Brady (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Armagh

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Armagh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,489
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Sep 2014