Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gualtiero Cardinal Bassetti

Archbishop of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1942 BornPopolano di Marradi
29 Jun 196624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
9 Jul 199452.3AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima-Piombino, Italy
8 Sep 199452.4Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima-Piombino, Italy
21 Nov 199856.6AppointedBishop of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy
6 Feb 199956.8InstalledBishop of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy
16 Jul 200967.3AppointedArchbishop of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve, Italy
4 Oct 200967.5InstalledArchbishop of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve, Italy
22 Feb 201471.9Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 201471.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
8 Jun 201472.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

MicroData Summary for Gualtiero Bassetti:
Gualtiero Cardinal Bassetti (born ) Archbishop of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,434
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014
  • cp: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014
  • i: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 23 Jul 2014