Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Huancayo

Archidioecesis Huancayensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 30 June 1966
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Peru
  • Square Kilometers: 15,145 (5,849 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Apartado 245, Jr. Puno 430, Huancayo, Peru
  • Telephone: (64)234.952; 232.774
  • Fax: 239.189

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Huancayo
18 December 1944ErectedDiocese of Huánuco Diocese of Huancayo (erected)
15 May 1958Territory LostDiocese of Huancayo
Diocese of Huánuco
Territorial Prelature of Tarma (erected)
Archdiocese of Huancayo
30 June 1966ElevatedDiocese of Huancayo Archdiocese of Huancayo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Huancayo
1950380,000380,000100.0%3241735,205505330ap1951
Archdiocese of Huancayo
1965370,000400,00092.5%4236784,743444046ap1967
1970370,000390,00094.9%1434487,708436534ap1971
1976755,652785,65296.2%31255613,4931326434ap1977
1980460,000630,00073.0%2826548,518336134ap1981
1990724,000799,00090.6%31285912,271364337ap1991
1999745,027827,80890.0%31225314,0571297244ap2000
2000764,894869,19888.0%35245912,9641477644ap2001
2001998,3501,092,99391.3%46267213,8651477244ap2002
2002684,493911,74475.1%39286710,216367344ap2003
2003720,224783,10792.0%41226311,432357344ap2004
2004728,867792,50592.0%43246710,878297446ap2005
2006748,000807,00092.7%40226212,064298044ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.6, 1 Jan 2012; data: 4 Jan 2012