Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ennio Cardinal Antonelli

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for the Family

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Andrea delle Fratte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1936 BornTodi
2 Apr 196023.4Ordained PriestPriest of Todi, Italy
25 May 198245.5AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
29 Aug 198245.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
6 Oct 198851.9AppointedArchbishop of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve, Italy
26 May 199558.5ResignedArchbishop of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve, Italy
21 Mar 200164.3AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
20 May 200164.5InstalledArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
21 Oct 200366.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200366.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Andrea delle Fratte
7 Jun 200871.6AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Family
26 Jun 201275.6RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Family

MicroData Summary for Ennio Antonelli:
Ennio Cardinal Antonelli (born ) President Emeritus of Family

Please contact the Cardinal through the Pontifical Council for the Family.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jun 2008
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2012
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 23 Jul 2014