Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Andrew Cardinal Yeom Soo-jung

Archbishop of Seoul

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono

Apostolic Administrator of P’yŏng-yang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1943 BornAnsong
8 Dec 197330.0Ordained PriestPriest of Seoul, Korea (South)
1 Dec 200157.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
1 Dec 200157.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibiuca
25 Jan 200258.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibiuca
10 May 201268.4AppointedArchbishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
10 May 201268.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of P’yŏng-yang, Korea (North)
25 Jun 201268.5InstalledArchbishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
22 Feb 201470.2Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 201470.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
4 Oct 201470.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono

MicroData Summary for Andrew Yeom Soo-jung:
Andrew Cardinal Yeom Soo-jung (born ) Archbishop of Seoul

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Seoul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 May 2012
  • i: CB, 10 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,121
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014
  • cp: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014
  • i: Bollettino, 26 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 28 Aug 2015