Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

Archidioecesis Sancti Iacobi in Chile



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 21 May 1840
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Chile
  • Square Kilometers: 9,132 (3,527 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.iglesiadesantiago.cl/
  • Mailing Address: Erasmo Escala 1872, Santiago, Chile
  • Telephone: (02)787.56.00
  • Fax: 787.56.33

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Santiago de Chile
27 June 1561ErectedDiocese of La Plata o Charcas
Archdiocese of Lima
Diocese of Santiago de Chile (erected)
22 March 1563Territory LostDiocese of Santiago de Chile Diocese of Concepción (erected)
10 May 1570Territory LostDiocese of Santiago de Chile (Tucumán) Diocese of Córdoba (Tucumán) (erected)
Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
21 May 1840ElevatedDiocese of Santiago de Chile Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
1 July 1840Territory LostArchdiocese of Santiago de Chile Diocese of La Serena (erected)
18 October 1925Territory LostArchdiocese of Santiago de Chile Diocese of Rancagua (erected)
18 October 1925Territory LostArchdiocese of Santiago de Chile Diocese of San Felipe (erected)
18 October 1925Territory LostArchdiocese of Santiago de Chile Diocese of Talca (erected)
18 October 1925Territory LostArchdiocese of Santiago de Chile Diocese of Valparaíso (erected)
13 July 1987Territory LostArchdiocese of Santiago de Chile Diocese of San Bernardo (erected)
4 April 1991Territory LostArchdiocese of Santiago de Chile Diocese of Melipilla (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
19501,450,0001,620,00089.5%2363936292,3057401,500115ap1951
19661,720,4132,347,21573.3%3287181,0461,6449602,590177ap1967
19703,078,0003,684,00083.6%4046901,0942,8131,0712,840188ap1971
19763,400,0003,946,70486.1%2586509083,744361,0062,000204ap1977
19803,419,0004,361,00078.4%2465958414,065631,0492,250202ap1981
19903,234,0004,497,00071.9%2651,1681,4332,256701,8764,066202ap1991
19993,709,9515,013,44874.0%2765538294,4751381,3142,785197ap2000
20003,716,9415,083,70473.1%2655608254,5051451,1742,203197ap2001
20013,813,2465,153,03974.0%2784507285,2371569062,952200ap2002
20023,862,2075,219,19974.0%2925077994,8331661,0852,924199ap2003
20033,910,2815,284,16474.0%2855368214,7621761,0802,395199ap2004
20043,559,0815,128,35969.4%2745448184,3501931,0932,578202ap2005
20104,059,0005,848,00069.4%2775708474,7923121,0191,808209ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Apr 2014