Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Julius Riyadi Cardinal Darmaatmadja, S.J.

Archbishop Emeritus of Jakarta

Cardinal-Priest of Sacro Cuore di Maria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1934 BornMuntilan
18 Dec 196935.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
19 Feb 198348.2AppointedArchbishop of Semarang, Indonesia
29 Jun 198348.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Semarang, Indonesia
28 Apr 198449.4AppointedBishop of Indonesia, Military
26 Nov 199459.9Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199459.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sacro Cuore di Maria
11 Jan 199661.1AppointedArchbishop of Jakarta, Indonesia
2 Jan 200671.0ResignedBishop of Indonesia, Military
28 Jun 201075.5RetiredArchbishop of Jakarta, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Julius Riyadi Darmaatmadja:
Cardinal Julius Riyadi Darmaatmadja S.J. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Jakarta

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Jakarta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jan 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013