Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Dhaka

Archidioecesis Dhakensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Bejoy Nicephorus D’Cruze, O.M.I., Archbishop
  • Subroto Boniface Gomes, Auxiliary Bishop-Elect
  • Patrick D’Rozario, C.S.C., Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Theotonius Gomes, C.S.C., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 19 October 1982
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Bangladesh
  • Square Kilometers: 12,500 (4,828 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, G.P.O. Box 3, 1 Kakrail Road, Ramna, Dhaka 1000, Bangladesh
  • Telephone: (02)935.82.47

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Bengal
15 February 1850ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Bengal Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Bengal (erected)
Diocese of Eastern Bengal
1 September 1886ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Bengal Diocese of Eastern Bengal
Diocese of Dacca
1887Name ChangedDiocese of Eastern Bengal Diocese of Dacca
25 May 1927Territory LostDiocese of Dacca Diocese of Chittagong (erected)
3 July 1929Territory AddedDiocese of São Tomé of Meliapore (Nossa Senhora da Piedade in the city of Daccha, Hashnabad, Tesgonge, and Nagory) Diocese of Dacca
Archdiocese of Dacca
15 July 1950ElevatedDiocese of Dacca Archdiocese of Dacca
17 January 1952Territory LostDiocese of Chittagong (Sylhet and parts in India)
Archdiocese of Dacca (Tripura)
Prefecture Apostolic of Haflong (erected)
Archdiocese of Dhaka
19 October 1982Name ChangedArchdiocese of Dacca Archdiocese of Dhaka
15 May 1987Territory LostArchdiocese of Dhaka (Mymensingh, Tangail, Kishoreganj, Netrakona, Japalpur, and Sherpur) Diocese of Mymensingh (erected)
8 July 2011Territory LostArchdiocese of Dhaka (Sylhet, Sunamganj, Habigganj, and Moulibazar) Diocese of Sylhet (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Dacca
195035,37818,200,000.2%2438625702110522ap1951
197063,30925,000,000.3%2433571,1106322126ap1971
198081,16930,706,000.3%2629551,47516622626ap1981
Archdiocese of Dhaka
199056,93226,347,000.2%35387377910136028ap1991
199968,62930,148,790.2%34407492710656319ap2000
200070,82130,157,061.2%42539574513457319ap2001
200170,06030,170,665.2%38539176912649819ap2002
200266,78530,258,660.2%31528380413250819ap2003
200373,50830,563,833.2%33579081611052620ap2004
200474,87130,574,441.2%33599281311054420ap2005
200679,00830,581,248.3%446410873112656220ap2007
201079,08031,210,520.3%557212762214356021ap2011
201162,08022,948,906.3%485810658514053015bul8Jun2011
201362,78023,339,945.3%527312550213356318ap2014
201676,07223,673,082.3%446310771013534119ap2017
201980,48724,419,640.3%485710576617833824ap2020
202185,01424,986,650.3%566311971418935529ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Bengal
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 121
  • Diocese of Dacca
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 22, Page 121, to Page 123
  • Archdiocese of Dacca
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 43, Page 66, to Page 69
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
    Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 15 Feb 2024