Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Cano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bosa

Titular Bishop of Tenedus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1829BornGergei
5 Jun 185222.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 187142.4AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
11 Feb 187242.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
Feb 1905³75.5ResignedBishop of Bosa, Italy
15 Apr 190777.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tenedus
12 Mar 191484.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Bosa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Cano:
Bishop Eugenio Cano (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bosa

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 153

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013