Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mattei Augusto Mengacci

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1801BornS. Angelo in Vado
31 Mar 182725.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 185150.0AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
16 Nov 185150.2Ordained BishopBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
20 Nov 187271.2DiedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mattei Augusto Mengacci:
Bishop Mattei Augusto Mengacci (born , died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 206

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013