Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felix-Marie de Neckere

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Melitene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1824BornYpris, Belgium
3 Apr 184723.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 187551.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Melitene
3 Oct 187551.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Melitene
30 Jan 190378.8DiedTitular Archbishop of Melitene

MicroData Summary for Felix-Marie de Neckere:
Archbishop Felix-Marie de Neckere (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Melitene

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 377

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013