Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaetano Pace-Forno, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malta

Titular Archbishop of Rhodus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1809BornRabat Gozo
20 Jul 182415.1ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
22 Sep 183223.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
25 Sep 185748.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Malta
25 Sep 185748.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hebron
4 Oct 185748.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hebron
4 Dec 185748.5SucceededBishop of Malta
4 Dec 185748.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
31 May 185849.0InstalledBishop of Malta
22 Jul 187465.1DiedBishop of Malta

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Pace-Forno:
Archbishop Gaetano Pace-Forno O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Malta

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 300, and Page 378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013