Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Rosani, Sch. P. †

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Titular Bishop of Erythrum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1787BornAcceglio
25 Aug 181022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
22 Jan 184456.3AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
22 Jan 184456.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrum
28 Jan 184456.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrum
1847¹59.2ResignedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
8 Aug 186274.8DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Rosani (VIAF: 88635224)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Rosani Sch. P. (born , died ) President Emeritus of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 189
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Dec 2016