Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Landi-Vittorj

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1787Born
21 Apr 181022.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 184456.5AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
28 Jan 184456.6Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
25 Aug 186780.1DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Landi-Vittorj (VIAF: 89148204)
Bishop Luigi Landi-Vittorj (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCori
Ordained BishopSaint Pantaleon, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,857, Page 94
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,844, Number 3
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 3, Number 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast