Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Antonio Nostrano

Deceased

Archbishop of Corf¨, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1768Born
19 Mar 179324.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 183061.4AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
12 Apr 183061.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
May 1852²83.6DiedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Antonio Nostrano
Archbishop Pietro Antonio Nostrano (born , died May 1852) Archbishop of Corf¨

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCattaro

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 163
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,830, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast