Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe-Maria de Letto (Leto)

Deceased

Bishop of Valva e Sulmona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1774BornSulmona
24 Mar 179824.2Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 182955.3SelectedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
27 Jul 182955.5ConfirmedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
2 Aug 182955.5Ordained BishopBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
10 Nov 183965.8DiedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe-Maria de Letto (Leto):
Bishop Giuseppe-Maria de Letto (Leto) (born , died ) Bishop of Valva e Sulmona

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 388

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013