Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Raffaelli

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1791BornFosciandora
1815¹23.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 183948.8AppointedBishop of Carpi, Italy
19 Jan 184048.9Ordained BishopBishop of Carpi, Italy
20 Apr 184958.1AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
23 Jul 186675.4DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Raffaelli:
Bishop Pietro Raffaelli (born , died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 478
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013