Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael O’Connor, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA

Member of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1810Born
1 Jun 183322.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Aug 184332.8AppointedBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
15 Aug 184332.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
29 Jul 185342.8AppointedBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
20 Dec 185343.2AppointedBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
20 May 186049.6ResignedBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
23 Dec 186252.2ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
18 Oct 187262.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael O’Connor (VIAF: 42606185)
Bishop Michael O’Connor S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCobh, Diocese of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
Ordained BishopSant’Agata dei Goti, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 262, and Page 457
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 308
  • c2+: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast