Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Milesi Pironi Ferretti

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1817Born
1842²24.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 185841.0Elevated to Cardinal
18 Mar 185841.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
26 Sep 186043.5AppointedAbbot of Santi Vincenzo ed Anastasio alle tre Fontane, Italy
21 Mar 187053.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
3 Apr 187053.0Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
2 Aug 187356.3DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Milesi Pironi Ferretti (VIAF: 89733409)
Giuseppe Cardinal Milesi Pironi Ferretti (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncona
Ordained BishopSantissima TrinitÓ, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano cemetery, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
  • a cardinal for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 45, and Page 50
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1858
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1870, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017