Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Lanzetta

Deceased

Bishop of Lacedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1767BornCalvanico
18 Jun 179124.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 182861.6SelectedBishop of Oria, Italy
18 May 182962.0ConfirmedBishop of Oria, Italy
24 May 182962.0Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
4 Apr 183062.9InstalledBishop of Oria, Italy
6 Apr 183264.9ResignedBishop of Oria, Italy
4 Oct 183366.4SelectedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
20 Jan 183466.7ConfirmedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
25 Apr 184274.9DiedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Lanzetta:
Bishop Michele Lanzetta (born , died ) Bishop of Lacedonia

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 231, and Page 385

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013