Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Bedini

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1801Born
17 Apr 182423.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 185352.6AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
8 Jan 185452.7Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
29 Sep 186261.4ResignedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
8 Jan 186462.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Bedini
Bishop Nicola Bedini (born , died ) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTagliacozzo, Diocese of Marsi
Ordained BishopS. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 541
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast