Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Giuseppe Longobardi

Deceased

Bishop of Andria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1804BornCastellamare di Stabia
14 Apr 182722.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 185247.8AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
28 Mar 185247.8Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
2 Nov 187066.4DiedBishop of Andria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giuseppe Longobardi:
Bishop Giovanni Giuseppe Longobardi (born , died ) Bishop of Andria

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1861
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013