Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Angelo Luigi Pacifico Grati, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Callinicum

Prior General of Order of Friar Servants of Mary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1763BornFalconara
19 Dec 178926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
15 Dec 182865.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Callinicum
28 Dec 182865.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callinicum
1829²65.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
1833²69.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
6 Jun 183572.2AppointedPrior General of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
17 Sep 184986.5DiedTitular Bishop of Callinicum

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Angelo Luigi Pacifico Grati
Bishop Pietro Angelo Luigi Pacifico Grati O.S.M. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Callinicum

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1828, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Jul 2016