Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Pablo Vásquez Bizcaíno (y Sánchez)

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1769BornAtlixco
19 Oct 183061.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
25 Feb 183161.9AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
6 Mar 183161.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
1 Jul 183162.3InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
7 Oct 184778.5DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Francisco Pablo Vásquez Bizcaíno (y Sánchez):
Bishop Francisco Pablo Vásquez Bizcaíno (y Sánchez) (born , died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 176, and Page 372

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015