Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tommaso Maria Cardinal Martinelli, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Index

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1827Born
1842²14.9EnteredMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
19 Apr 184417.2ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
22 Dec 184922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
22 Dec 187346.8Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jan 187446.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
12 Mar 187447.1AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for Studies
17 Sep 187548.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
18 Oct 187750.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
15 Jul 187851.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
24 Mar 188457.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
24 Mar 188457.1AppointedBishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy
30 Mar 188457.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy
30 Mar 188861.1DiedBishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Maria Martinelli (VIAF: 89298378)
Tommaso Maria Cardinal Martinelli O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Prefect of Index

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant'Anna, Archdiocese of Lucca, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Agostino, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)OESA Chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
  • a cardinal for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 45, and Page 52
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 54
  • c134: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 3
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1873

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017