Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joaquim Cardinal Arcoverde de Albuquerque Cavalcanti

Deceased

Archbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1850BornCimbres
4 Apr 187424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Olinda, Brazil
26 Jun 189040.4AppointedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
26 Oct 189040.8Ordained BishopBishop of Goiás, Brazil
27 Oct 189141.8ResignedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
26 Aug 189242.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
26 Aug 189242.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Argos
19 Aug 189444.6SucceededBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
30 Sep 189444.7InstalledBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
31 Aug 189747.6AppointedArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
11 Dec 190555.9Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 190555.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio
18 Apr 193080.3DiedArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Arcoverde de Albuquerque Cavalcanti:
Cardinal Joaquim Arcoverde de Albuquerque Cavalcanti (born , died ) Archbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
  • a cardinal for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 120, and Page 288
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 444, and Page 507
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013