Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Placido Pozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Mondovi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1819Born
21 May 184222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mondovi, Italy
25 Jul 187353.8AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
3 Aug 187353.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mondovi, Italy
17 Jan 189777.3DiedBishop of Mondovi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Placido Pozzi (VIAF: 89358350)
Bishop Placido Pozzi (born , died ) Bishop of Mondovi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillanova, Diocese of Mondovi
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 395
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017