Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco de’ Marchesi Canali

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1788Born
14 Mar 181224.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 183446.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
30 Sep 183446.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
5 Oct 183446.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
8 Jul 183951.3AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
5 Sep 184658.5DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco de’ Marchesi Canali
Bishop Francesco de’ Marchesi Canali (born , died ) Bishop of Pesaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRieti

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1845
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 95, and Page 308
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast