Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bartolomeo Cardinal d’Avanzo

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi e Teano

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1811BornAvella
20 Sep 183423.2Ordained PriestPriest of Nola, Italy
18 Mar 185240.7AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
28 Mar 185240.7Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
13 Jul 186049.0AppointedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
3 Apr 187664.8Elevated to Cardinal
7 Apr 187664.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
20 Oct 188473.3DiedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo d’Avanzo:
Cardinal Bartolomeo d’Avanzo (born , died ) Bishop of Calvi e Teano

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
  • a cardinal for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 174, and Page 190
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013