Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Langdon Grace, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA

Titular Archbishop of Siunia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1814Born
21 Dec 183925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Jan 185944.1AppointedBishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
24 Jul 185944.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
29 Jul 185944.7InstalledBishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
31 Jul 188469.7ResignedBishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
12 Aug 188469.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Mennith
24 Sep 188974.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Siunia
22 Feb 189782.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Langdon Grace (VIAF: 60482181)
Archbishop Thomas Langdon Grace O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Paul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCharleston, Diocese of Charleston, South Carolina
Ordained BishopSaint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri
Death PlaceSaint Paul, Diocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 380, and Page 445
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 522
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017