Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arcangelo Polidori

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1773Born
24 Sep 179623.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 183461.5AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
2 Nov 183461.6Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
10 May 184370.1DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Arcangelo Polidori
Bishop Arcangelo Polidori (born , died ) Bishop of Foligno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoreto

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 199
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast