Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Pellei

Deceased

Bishop of Acquapendente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1796³BornCastignano
18 Sep 181923.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 184549.2AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
21 Dec 184549.3Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
14 Jun 184750.8AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
22 Nov 187781.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Acquapendente, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Pellei:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Pellei (born , died ) Bishop of Acquapendente

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 113
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 346

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013