Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adriano Giampedi

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1785Born
16 Jun 181024.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 184256.2AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
30 Jan 184256.2Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
11 Oct 185064.9DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Adriano Giampedi (VIAF: 88999695)
Bishop Adriano Giampedi (born , died ) Bishop of Alatri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Trastevere, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1845
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 64
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast