Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Owen Patrick Bernard Corrigan

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

Titular Bishop of Macri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1849Born
7 Jun 187324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
3 Oct 190859.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
3 Oct 190859.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Macri
10 Jan 190959.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macri
8 Apr 192980.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary for Owen Patrick Bernard Corrigan
Bishop Owen Patrick Bernard Corrigan (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Baltimore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,439
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1909, Number 2
  • c1: CB, 11 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022