Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Joseph Richter

Deceased

Bishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1838Born
10 Jun 186527.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
30 Jan 188344.8AppointedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
22 Apr 188345.0Ordained BishopBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
26 Dec 191678.7DiedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Henry Joseph Richter
Bishop Henry Joseph Richter (born , died ) Bishop of Grand Rapids

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuenkirchen, Diocese of Münster, Germany
Ordained BishopGrand Rapids, Diocese of Grand Rapids, Michigan

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 290
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017