Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Serafini

Deceased

Secretary of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1808Born
21 Aug 185345.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Aug 185345.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 187062.0AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
17 Jul 187062.1Ordained BishopBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
12 Mar 187768.7Elevated to Cardinal
20 Mar 187768.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
20 Feb 188071.7ResignedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
13 May 188475.9AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
31 Jul 188577.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
1 Jun 188879.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
19 Jun 189385.0AppointedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other
1 Feb 189485.6DiedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Luigi Serafini (VIAF: 89433894)
Luigi Cardinal Serafini (born , died ) Secretary of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMagliano Sabina, Diocese of Sabina, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. John Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Pontifical Urban Athenaeum of Propaganda Fide Chapel,CampoVerano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
  • a cardinal for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 593, and Page 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 48
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017