Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert John Seton

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1839Born
15 Apr 186525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
22 Jun 190363.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia
5 Jul 190363.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia
22 Mar 192787.5DiedTitular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia

MicroData Summary for Robert John Seton (VIAF: 89792528)
Archbishop Robert John Seton (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLivorno, Italy

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 301
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,903, Number 29
  • c1: CB, 21 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast