Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Salomone

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1803BornAvellino
31 Mar 182724.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Nov 184441.6SelectedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
20 Jan 184541.8ConfirmedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
26 Jan 184541.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
9 Dec 185754.7SelectedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
21 Dec 185754.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
9 Mar 187268.9DiedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Salomone:
Archbishop Antonio Salomone (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno)

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 491
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013