Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filippo Manetti

Deceased

Abbot of Subiaco, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Sardes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1817Born
4 Apr 184022.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 186749.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Subiaco, Italy
22 Feb 186749.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
10 Mar 186749.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
17 Sep 187558.0AppointedAbbot of Subiaco, Italy
17 Sep 187558.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sardes
28 Sep 187962.0DiedAbbot of Subiaco, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Manetti
Archbishop Filippo Manetti (born , died ) Abbot of Subiaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRonciglione, Diocese of Nepi e Sutri
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 501, and Page 567
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,867, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast