Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Romanò

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1789Born
18 Jan 181323.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jun 183344.0SelectedBishop of Como, Italy
20 Jan 183444.7ConfirmedBishop of Como, Italy
26 Jan 183444.7Ordained BishopBishop of Como, Italy
13 Nov 185566.5DiedBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Romanò
Bishop Carlo Romanò (born , died ) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCantù

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 158
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast