Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Paulus Augustus Foscolo

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1785Born
16 Apr 180822.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 181630.4AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
17 Mar 181630.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
30 Dec 182944.2ResignedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
15 Mar 183044.4AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
4 Oct 184761.9AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
7 Jun 186074.6DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

MicroData Summary for Paulus Augustus Foscolo
Patriarch Paulus Augustus Foscolo (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Ignasio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,816, Number 6
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 87, and Page 163
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 214
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 635

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast