Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Michael Conroy

Deceased

Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

Apostolic Delegate to Canada and Newfoundland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1832Born
6 Jun 185724.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Feb 187138.1AppointedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
11 Apr 187138.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
10 Apr 187744.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Canada and Newfoundland
4 Aug 187845.5DiedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

MicroData Summary for George Michael Conroy (VIAF: 104480953)
Bishop George Michael Conroy (born , died ) Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDurndalk, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained BishopLongford

  • a priest for 21.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,871, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast