Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Francis Howley

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1843Born
6 Jun 186824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
5 Dec 188542.1AppointedPrefect of Western Newfoundland (St. George’s), Canada
29 Apr 189248.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Newfoundland (St. George’s), Canada
29 Apr 189248.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Amastris
24 Jun 189248.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amastris
5 Jan 189551.2AppointedBishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
8 Feb 190460.3AppointedArchbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
15 Oct 1914³71.0DiedArchbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Francis Howley (VIAF: 9382721)
Archbishop Michael Francis Howley (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. John's, Newfoundland, Diocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland
Ordained BishopS. Jean Bapt., Cathedral, St. John's, Newfoundland, Diocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 93, and Page 322
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017