Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agostino Cardinal Silj

Deceased

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1846BornCalcara di Visso, Italy
4 Apr 187427.7Ordained PriestPriest of Norcia, Italy
26 Dec 190660.5AppointedSecret Almoner of the Office of Papal Charities
26 Dec 190660.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea Ponti
13 Jan 190760.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea Ponti
6 Dec 191670.4AppointedVice-Chamberlain of the Apostolic Chamber
15 Dec 191973.4Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 191973.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
20 Mar 192073.7AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
27 Feb 192679.6DiedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Agostino Silj:
Cardinal Agostino Silj (born , died ) Prefect of Apostolic Signatura

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
  • a cardinal for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1907, Number 2
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013