Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Castruccio Cardinal Castracane degli Antelminelli

Deceased

Bishop of Palestrina, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1779Born
15 Dec 182546.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
15 Dec 182849.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
15 Apr 183353.5Elevated to Cardinal
29 Jul 183353.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
11 Dec 183455.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
7 Oct 183758.0AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
12 Nov 183960.1AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
22 Jan 184464.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
11 Feb 184464.3Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
22 Feb 185272.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for Castruccio Castracane degli Antelminelli (VIAF: 68920818)
Castruccio Cardinal Castracane degli Antelminelli (born , died ) Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrbino
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Pietro in Vincoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
  • a cardinal for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1833
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 8
  • x933: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast