Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Valentini

Deceased

Bishop of Amelia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1805Born
22 Dec 182722.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 185146.1AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
24 Feb 185146.1Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
2 Aug 185550.5DiedBishop of Amelia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Valentini (VIAF: 258086573)
Bishop Salvatore Valentini (born , died ) Bishop of Amelia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopS. Laurent in Damaso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 27.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1854
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 95
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018