Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Attilio Fiascaini

Deceased

Bishop of Arezzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1778BornPrato
21 Mar 180122.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 183456.6AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
28 Dec 183456.6Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
30 Jan 184364.7AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
25 Nov 186082.5DiedBishop of Arezzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Attilio Fiascaini (VIAF: 88781682)
Bishop Attilio Fiascaini (born , died ) Bishop of Arezzo

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 88, and Page 156
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Aug 2016