Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Aloysius Maguire

Deceased

Archbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1851Born
27 Mar 187523.5Ordained PriestPriest of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
6 Apr 189442.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
6 Apr 189442.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Trocmades
11 Jun 189442.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trocmades
4 Aug 190250.9AppointedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
14 Oct 192069.0DiedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Aloysius Maguire
Archbishop John Aloysius Maguire (born , died ) Archbishop of Glasgow

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalton, Glasgow, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, Scotland
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Death PlaceArchbishop's House, Charing Cross, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter, Cemetery, Dalbeth, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 287, and Page 568
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 24
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 1 Apr 2018