Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lorenzo Pontillo

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1792BornCasanova
23 Sep 181624.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 183341.4SelectedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
20 Jan 183441.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
26 Jan 183441.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
10 Nov 187381.5DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Pontillo
Archbishop Lorenzo Pontillo (born , died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 171
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Aug 2016